Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:12 (UTC).

S.C. ANDERSON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION VS DMILES GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 S C ANDERSON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DMILES GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0442

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON GROUP INTERNATIONAL

S.C. ANDERSON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORTION

Defendant

DMILES GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOGT, GEORGE F, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

DALMORE, JEAN A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

08/19/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: VOGT, GEORGE F, Jr.; Defendant; Attorney: DALMORE, JEAN A

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: t/e 5 to 7 days plaintiff waived jury/defense requested jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: On Complaint, entire action dismissed WITH prejudice. Endorsed copy returned via First Legal Support Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Waiver - Comment: CANON 3 WAIVER - Signed by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 08/19/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: VOGT, GEORGE F, Jr.; Defendant; Attorney: DALMORE, JEAN A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Settlement Conference Statement - Comment: Filed by Gina L. Moyles, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY GEORGE F. VOGT, JR., ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DMILES GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; PERSONAL SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less