Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:49 (UTC).

SAYLOR VS SHIOMOTO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SAYLOR filed an Other lawsuit against SHIOMOTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria, Woodward, Cory J., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Zulfa, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Zulfa, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAYLOR

Defendant

SHIOMOTO

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

MO 07/24/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Case Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Miscellaneous Filing - Comment: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Confidential Document - Comment: JUDGE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY & PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - MO 07/24/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Confidential Document - Comment: JUDGE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Confidential Document - Comment: MEMO FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less