This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:54:11 (UTC).

SAWYER, Jr. VS SAWYER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 SAWYER, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAWYER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1638

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAWYER, WILLIE R, Jr.

Respondent

SAWYER, FRANCES BELL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO WILLIE SAWYER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: SAWYER, WILLIE R, Jr.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS: 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO WILLIE SAWYER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: SAWYER, WILLIE R, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Comment: PET FW $435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less