This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 15:39:13 (UTC).

SAT-INSCORE VS INSCORE

Case Summary

On 05/01/2013 SAT-INSCORE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against INSCORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7783

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAT - INSCORE, PAIGE

Petitioners

SAT-INSCORE, PAIGE

SORENSEN, PAIGE

Defendant

INSCORE, TERRY

Respondent

INSCORE, TERRY DENNIS, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Respondent

MO-Resp RFO: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: Modify CC/V filed 5/26/15 Mediation set for 6/17/15 at 9:30 am; Parties Present Petitioner: SAT-INSCORE, PAIGE; Respondent: INSCORE, TERRY

DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 07/19/2019: Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Review

Review 09/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Review

Review 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: HEARING DATE 8/4/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 09/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketProposed Judgment - Comment: AMENDED MAILED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CATINA HOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for SAT-INSCORE, PAIGE (PE-1). Received from PAIGE SAT-INSCORE. Receipt #715144 for amount of $435.00. Detail: 2 x $100 3 x $50 5 x $20 CHANGE: 1 x $10 1 x $5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 749

    Read MoreRead Less