Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:03:02 (UTC).

SANTIAGO VS SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SANTIAGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Compton, James L. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1677

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Compton, James L.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANTIAGO, ANGELA

Respondent

SANTIAGO, EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: SANTIAGO, ANGELA; SANTIAGO, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less