Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:15 (UTC).

SANTIAGO VS RODGERS (D)

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SANTIAGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODGERS D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L. and Fielder, John L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1674

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANTIAGO, SANTOS

Respondent

RODGERS, JESSICA DAWN

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver Review

FEE WAIVER REVIEW AS TO JESSICA RODGERS - Public: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW 2ND REQUEST FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: RODGERS, JESSICA DAWN

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/07/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTIAGO, SANTOS; Respondent: RODGERS, JESSICA DAWN

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: HRG. 10/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/07/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTIAGO, SANTOS; Respondent: RODGERS, JESSICA DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • No Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 10/07/16 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V C/S 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: KERN DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less