This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:50:52 (UTC).

SANTIAGO VS ARREGIN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 SANTIAGO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARREGIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0139

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIAGO, FELIX

Defendant

ARREGIN, JESUS RAFAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SANTIAGO, FELIX; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 415 Eastern Ave Taft, CA 93268; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ARREGIN, JESUS RAFAEL; Party: Names: SANTIAGO, FELIX; ARREGIN, JESUS RAFAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Jesus Rafael Arregin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to Any and All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Jesus Rafael Arregin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SANTIAGO, FELIX; Served: 12/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 415 EASTERN AVE TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less