This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 18:18:38 (UTC).

SANTANA VS SAINZ

Case Summary

On 03/01/2016 SANTANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAINZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANTANA, MARILYN

Respondent

SAINZ, JONATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Payment Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 09/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: SANTANA, MARILYN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: RAMONA'S TYPING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.