This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 11:15:26 (UTC).

SANTANA VS ABARCA (C)

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 SANTANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABARCA C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn, Cannon, Gloria and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2346

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Benavides, Jose R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Cannon, Gloria

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL

Respondent

ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Respondent Attorneys

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 07/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES CC CV DRUG/ALCOHOL NO CORP PUNISHMENT; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Privately Retained: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 07/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V DRUG/ ALCOHOL RESTRICTIONS AND TESTING NO CORPORAL PUNISHMENT 3 MINORS

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 09/21/17 RES MOD C/C C/V C/S 3 MINORS CONT FROM 10/12 and 11/13, 12/11 *DIV A CAL ALSO* *3; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM C/S H/C INTERVENE STND ORDERS 3 MINORS

Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS)

Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS) 10/12/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/S 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Respondent; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees; Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 10/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $520.00; Parties Present Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 06/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: CS HC INTERVENE STND ORDS - 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/16/17 1/29/18 TWO MATTERS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 09/21/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

10/12/2017 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/S - 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 10/12/17 11/13/17 *TWO MATTERS* *ALSO ON DIV D CAL*

Request for Order - Petitioner

11/13/2017 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/08/17 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONT FROM 10/12 **RLM CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: 07/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V DRUG/ALCOHOL TESTING STMT OF DEC 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Privately Retained: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS)

Request for Order - Respondent(Modification-DCSS) 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/S - 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 10/12/17

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 09/08/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MATTER SET FOR FCCR- CSC 06/11, PET/RES RFO AT 1:30PM 06/20; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Comment: 09/08/17 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS **RLM CAL ALSO** NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Motion (DCSS) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: RE: CS HC INTERVENE STND ORDS 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/16/17, 1/29/18, 6/11/18, 10/22/18, 12/10/18, 4/22/19, 5/08/19 *2 MATTERS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Request for Order - DCSS Respondent (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: RE: MOD CS 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 10/12/17, 11/13/17 1/29/18, 6/11/18, 10/22/18, 4/22/19, 5/08/19 *2 MATTERS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - DCSS Respondent (Modification) - Motion (DCSS) 05/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: RE: MOD CS - 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/12/17, 11/13/17, 1/29/18, 6/11/18, 10/22/18, 4/22/19 *TWO MATTERS*; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 05/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: CS HC INTERVENE STND ORDS - 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/16/17, 1/29/18, 6/11/18, 10/22/18, 12/10/18, 4/22/19 2 MATTERS; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 07/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V DRUG/ALCOHOL TEST STMT OF DEC CONTD FROM 1/12/17 11/13/17 12/11/17 01/29/18 06/11/18 08/16/18 12/10 4/22/19 ***MATTER TO BE HEARD 1ST AT 8:30 A.M.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/08/17 PET C/C C/V 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 1/12/17 11/13/17 12/11/17 01/29/18 06/11/18 08/16/18 12/10 4/22/19 ***MATTER TO BE CALLED 1ST AT 8:30 A.M.***; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/21/17 RES C/C C/V C/S 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 1/12/17 11/13/17 12/11/17 01/29/18 06/11/18 08/16/18 12/10/18 4/22/19 ***MATTER TO BE CALLED 1ST AT 8:30 A.M.***; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Witness List (FL-321)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 04/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V DRUG/ALCOHOL TEST STMT OF DEC CONTD FROM 1/12/17 11/13/17 12/11/17 01/29/18 06/11/18 08/16/18 12/10 **DIV A CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: SANTANA, JUAN MANUEL; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Respondent: ABARCA, ROSA GUADALUPE; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • Amended Petition - Comment: 1ST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 5/26/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.