This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:14 (UTC).

SANDSTROM VS SANDSTROM

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 SANDSTROM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDSTROM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDSTROM, CHY LEAH

Respondent

SANDSTROM, WILLIAM LAWRENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: SANDSTROM, CHY LEAH; SANDSTROM, WILLIAM LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.