Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:53 (UTC).

SANDRA RIVERA VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SANDRA RIVERA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0463

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA, SANDRA

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE, WILLIAM R

Defendant Attorney

ARENS, MARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: t/e 5 days jury both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: j/t 10/3/16 t/e 5 days 9am dept 11 jury both sides & fcmc 9/30/16 130pm dept 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding - Comment: Notice of Statement of Opposition ot Defendant's Petition for Coordination. Submitted by William R. McGee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding - Comment: Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for hearing. Submitted by Mary Lynn Arens, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Service Copy / Coordination Proceeding - Comment: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination. Submitted by May Lynn Arens, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Mary Lynn Arens, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by William R. Mcgee, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PURSUANT TO HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN, RE-SUBMIT NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OMITTING EXHIBIT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Ford Motor Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less