Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 13:33:22 (UTC).

SANDRA CLAUDETTE WILLIAMSON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 SANDRA CLAUDETTE WILLIAMSON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2333

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMSON, JOSHUA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 5/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 5/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less