This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 09:05:45 (UTC).

SANDOVAL VS BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 SANDOVAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3341

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

Defendant

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Guardian Ad Litem

GARCIA, NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESAROS CHRISTOPHER P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/12/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

12/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

12/12/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

12/27/2022: Order to Show Cause

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

12/29/2022: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Appointing Nancy Garcia as guardian ad litem for Margarita Sandoval, a minor; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 04/07/2023Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SANDOVAL, MARGARITA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less