This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:26 (UTC).

SANDOVAL PENA VS RODRIGUEZ ARANA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 SANDOVAL PENA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ ARANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0246

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDOVAL PENA, EDUARDO

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ ARANA, OLGA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: SANDOVAL PENA, EDUARDO; RODRIGUEZ ARANA, OLGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Family Law Documents - Requested By: SANDOVAL PENA, EDUARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less