Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 13:36:57 (UTC).

SANDERSON VS CAMPBELL ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 SANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0925

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDERSON, KELLY

SANDERSON

Defendants

CAMPBELL, TERREL

CAMPBELL, DAVID

CAMPBELL, MEGAN

CAMPBELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, MATTHEW C

FITZ-SIMMONS, DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

STEAD, CALVIN R

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Attn: Calvin R. Stead: re: Answer to Complaint: ARE YOU COUNSEL FOR ALL THREE DEFENDANTS OR JUST TWO? IF ALL DEFENDANTS, THE FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IS MISSING FOR MEGAN CAMPBELL

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E: 5 days Plaintiff's jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Jury Trial/Final CMC - 03/28/22 in D-11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial dated 11/02/2020 addressed to DOUGLAS FITZ-SIMMONS returned to the court undelivered. Remailed to correct address of 1731 Chester Avenue Bakersfield, CA 93301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference set on 03/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 11. Mandatory Settlement Conference set on 03/04/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 10/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Terrel Campbell via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to David Campbell via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Attn: Calvin R. Stead: re: Answer to Complaint: ARE YOU COUNSEL FOR ALL THREE DEFENDANTS OR JUST TWO? IF ALL DEFENDANTS, THE FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IS MISSING FOR MEGAN CAMPBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 05/02/20202:57 PM; Served: 05/11/20204:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sanderson is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMPBELL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEAD, CALVIN R