This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:14:50 (UTC).

SANDERS VS STANLEY

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 SANDERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STANLEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1311

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAYBERRY, DORIS

BROXTON, JEAN MARIE

SEXTON, MARY HASSIE

SANDERS, JOAN DELORES

Defendants

STANLEY, LORA

STANLEY, BOBBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINTER, JODY LLOYD

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AS TO WRIT. RETURNED VIA ACS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Item 1 e 1 and 1 e 3 of default incomplete

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 2nd rejection. Item 1 a does not conform to complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Line item 1 a does not conform to complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AS TO WRIT. RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF SEAN A. FREDIN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SANDERS, JOAN DELORES; SEXTON, MARY HASSIE; BROXTON, JEAN MARIE; MAYBERRY, DORIS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 8172 Pioneer Dr Bakersfield, CA 93306; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: STANLEY, BOBBY; STANLEY, LORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Clerk's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to all occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Lora Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Bobby Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 8172 PIONEER DRIVE BAKERSFIELD, CA 93306 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SANDERS, JOAN DELORES, SEXTON, MARY HASSIE, BROXTON, JEAN MARIE, MAYBERRY, DORIS; Served: 03/18/201711:05 AM; Served: 03/18/201711:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less