Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 04:38:32 (UTC).

SANDERS VS SANDERS (D)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 SANDERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDERS D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Marquez, Raymonda B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3374

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Marquez, Raymonda B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDERS, GAIL EARNEST

Respondent

SANDERS, KEITH LAMONT

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SUMMONS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less