This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:46:05 (UTC).

SANDERS VS CORNELIUS

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SANDERS filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CORNELIUS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2225

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDERS, STAR LEE

Respondent

CORNELIUS, KEYTON

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 10/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Keyton Cornelius by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (CH-250) - Comment: for Response CH-120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120) - Comment: as to Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: **DENIED** NO JUDICIAL OFFICER SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: HRG: 10/13/2020 @8:30AM IN DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SANDERS, STAR LEE, CORNELIUS, KEYTON; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less