This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:24 (UTC).

SANDATE VS RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 SANDATE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1678

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDATE, PEDRO

Defendant

ANTHONY R RAMIREZ DBA NO LIMIT REPAIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AS TO ANTHONY R RAMIREZ DBA NO LIMIT REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: AS TO ANTHONY R RAMIREZ DBA NO LIMIT REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SANDATE, PEDRO; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO ANTHONY R RAMIREZ DBA NO LIMIT REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER (S)

    Read MoreRead Less