This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 13:49:06 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS SANCHEZ (E)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 SANCHEZ filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against SANCHEZ E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ, ISAAC T

Respondents

SANCHEZ, STEPHANIE

SANCHEZ, STEPHANIE A

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: PET $435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.