This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 16:25:47 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS KHAJVAND ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KHAJVAND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1931

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, JOSE CERVANTES

Defendants

KHAJVAND, ABDOLLAH

MARTINEZ, MARTIN

FARM FOOD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PANINI KABOB GRILL (0190AUYA), AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

FARM FOOD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOAYZA, MARISOL J.

Defendant Attorney

KHARAZI, HADI-TY S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1/21/22 Defendant, FARM FOOD, LLC; ABDOLLAH KHAJVAND; MARTIN MARTINEZ Motion to Compel re Request for Poduction of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1/21/22 Defendants, FARM FOOD, LLC; ABDOLLAH KHAJVAND; MARTIN MARTINEZ Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories - Employment Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1/21/22 Defendants, FARM FOOD, LLC; ABDOLLAH KHAJVAND; MARTIN MARTINEZ Motion to Compel Re Specially Prepared Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 11/30/21 Plaintiff, JOSE CERVANTES SANCHEZ Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 11/30/21 Plaintiff, JOSE CERVANTES SANCHEZ Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, Set One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi In Support of Mt. To Compel; Re: Request for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement - Comment: in Support of Motion To Compel; Re: Request for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion To Compel; Re: Request For Production Of Documents; Hearing Date: 2/25/22 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi In Support of Mt. To Compel; Re: Form Interrogatories -Employment Law

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Panini Kabob Grill via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Farm Food, Inc. via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Martin Martinez via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Abdollah Khajvand via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/31/20213:08 PM; Served: 08/31/20211:58 PM; Served: 08/31/20213:08 PM; Served: 08/31/20213:08 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S