This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/03/2023 at 07:00:54 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS GACS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GACS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Hopper, Tina and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0322

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Hopper, Tina

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ, GRISELDA

OROZCO, LUIS

Defendant

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER, ROBERT L, II

Defendant Attorney

STONE, GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion

02/23/2023: Notice of Motion

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

01/18/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

11/09/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Answer to First Amended Complaint

05/12/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

01/31/2023: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/29/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

07/20/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

First Amended Complaint

02/22/2022: First Amended Complaint

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

05/24/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 07/11/2023

07/11/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 07/11/2023

Case Management Conference 11/08/2022

11/08/2022: Case Management Conference 11/08/2022

Case Management Conference 08/08/2022

08/08/2022: Case Management Conference 08/08/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

06/03/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

04/29/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

04/21/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

02/09/2022: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Reply

06/01/2023: Reply

Separate Statement

05/25/2023: Separate Statement

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/05/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100322; Style/Defendant: SANCHEZ VS GACS ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Clark, Thomas S.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100322; Style/Defendant: SANCHEZ VS GACS ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Clark, Thomas S.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2024

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: estimate 7 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2024

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100322; Style/Defendant: SANCHEZ VS GACS ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2024

DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/JT: 02/04/2024 // T/E: 7 DAYS (D-17)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: to dismiss Albertson, LLC a Company.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketOrder on Motion; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO AND COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND REQUES FOR SANCTIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100322; Style/Defendant: SANCHEZ VS GACS ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Judge: Clark, Thomas S.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/23/2023 Plaintiff motion to compel responses to request for production of Documents

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2022

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Ken Gacs, via personal service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: on First Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketFirst Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 03/28/20221:30 PM; Served: 04/21/2022; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/25/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less