Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:12 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS EVERGREEN ARVIN HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EVERGREEN ARVIN HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0464

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ, DAVID

TORRES, EDWARD

Defendant

EVERGREEN ARVIN HEALTHCARE, LLC, DBA EVERGREEN ARVIN HEALTHCARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAWAI, JOHN A

Defendant Attorney

SUPPLE, JOHN L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/13/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

3/14/16 MO: Ex Parte Application: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/11/2016 Plaintiff Application for Order Substituting Plaintiff and Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KAWAI, JOHN A

Further Case Management Conference

02/08/16 - MO: Demurrer + Motion to Strike + CMC: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SPECIALLY SET AT 8:30 // ALSO HAS L&M Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KAWAI, JOHN A

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

3/18/16 MO: Ex Parte Application: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/11/16 Plaintiff Application for order substituting plaintiff and leave to file first amended complaint. Cont'd from 3/14/16

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Minute Order - OSC re 3.110 - 10/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Dismissal filed July 6, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action. Filed by John A. Kawai, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Ruling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Order to Show Cause scheduled for 6/17/2016 is continued to 8/04/2016 at 8:30 a.m. in department 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Further Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: (Cont'd from 02/08/16)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Notice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Law Firm name change effective 4/1/16 J Supple Law, A Professional Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: pursuant to crc, rule 3.110b (Cont'd from 10/30/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Evergeen Arvin Healthcare personal service 11/19/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Evergreen Arvin Healthcare personal service 10/19/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Notice of Order to Appear - Comment: and Show Cause why this matter should not be dismissed pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 (b) scheduled for 11/30/2015 at 8:30 a.m. in department 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Minute Order - OSC re 3.110 - 10/30/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less