This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 07:27:55 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS ANDREWS

Case Summary

On 08/13/2015 SANCHEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDREWS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0109

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, GUADALUPE

Defendant

ANDREWS, LORETTA

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Trial: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, GUADALUPE; Defendant: ANDREWS, LORETTA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SANCHEZ, GUADALUPE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 507 W Drummond Ave Bldg 4, Apt D2 Ridgecrest CA 93555; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: ANDREWS, LORETTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Trial: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SANCHEZ, GUADALUPE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less