Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:05 (UTC).

SANCHEZ VS AMAYA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 SANCHEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMAYA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1272

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, MIGUEL

Defendants

AMAYA, SALVADOR

AMAYA AUTO REPAIR

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, MIGUEL; Defendant: AMAYA, SALVADOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SANCHEZ, MIGUEL; Judgment Amount: $360.00; Awarded Against: AMAYA, SALVADOR; Comment: Plus court costs to be determined by the clerk.; Party: Names: SANCHEZ, MIGUEL; AMAYA, SALVADOR; Comment: Comment ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: FROM MR SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AMAYA AUTO REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, MIGUEL; Defendant: AMAYA, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SRV TO AMAYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA S BIN

    Read MoreRead Less