This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:33 (UTC).

SANCHEZ-LEMUS VS JUNGO(E)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SANCHEZ-LEMUS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JUNGO E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L., Canaday, Jim R, Bittleston, Dawn and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4169

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Canaday, Jim R

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ-LEMUS, BALDEMAR

Respondent

JUNGO, JANET

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00 CONT 11/03/17; Parties Present Petitioner: SANCHEZ-LEMUS, BALDEMAR

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Canaday, Jim R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/10/17 PET C/C C/V CONSOLIDATE CASES 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: SANCHEZ-LEMUS, BALDEMAR; Respondent: JUNGO, JANET

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00; Parties Present Petitioner: SANCHEZ-LEMUS, BALDEMAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 04/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: HRG DATE: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00 CONT 11/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less