This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 03:36:42 (UTC).

SANCHEZ ET AL VS S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 SANCHEZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against S S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1040

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, RAMON

HERNANDEZ, ALEJANDRA, Jr.

RAMOS, CELIA

RAMOS, RAMIRO

ESTRADA, DAVETH

SAAVEDRA, LUCIO

MUNOZ, JONATHAN

SAAVEDRA, KAREN

SOTO, RUDY

VILLATORO, JEFFERSON

CERVANTES, MICHAEL

SMITH, PATRICIA

PAMATZ, MARIA IRENE DURAN

RUBIN, MARY

CORTEZ, SYLVIA

CASTRO, OMAR

SARRETO, ROBERTO, Jr.

OROZCO, JOSE

CASTRO, ANA

Defendant

TJ DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELTON, JEFFREY T

Other Attorneys

FELD, JASON DANIEL

JEFFERY, MONA J

SMILEY, DAVID W.

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

TOOHEY, JOHN H

MURPHY, JASON M

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

LEVY, DAVID M

STEIN, MATTHEW A

PATRICIA, MCDONALD A

FIELDS, GARY D

BAYS, STEPHEN D

CANO, GINO

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/01/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason Feld Re: Cross-Complaint & Summons, Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint. Some of the name are not correct and the Does are missing from the Summons. Please correct and resubmit together with the Cross-Complaint. Thank you.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Accepted in Error To: George K. Milionis Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint. Pulte Home Company, LLC is not a party in this case and they have not filed a Cross-Complaint. Per attorney's office they will correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: George K. Milionis Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint. Incorrect venue. The document states it is for the County of Orange, not Kern County, and the case number is not one of ours. Please resubmit to the correct venue. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: Number 3 is incorrect. Party is not a defendant in this matter.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: 2nd rejection. #3 is incorrect, party is not a defendant in this matter, they are a cross- defendant. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Jason Feld; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a. and #6.d.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Jason Feld; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a. and #6.d.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint First appearance fee for Touchstone Plaza LLC required $1435

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement - Incorrect hearing date listed on document.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name: Paper filings are no longer accepted. Mandatory Electronic Filing

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Entry of Default. Cross-Complainant does not match Cross-Complaint.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: CONT'D FROM 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Entry of Default. Cross-Complainant does not match Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: as to Star Kern, Inc. dba Star Electric (ROE 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice to All Counsel RE PTO #3 Correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: By S & S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc. and TJ Development, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: On First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defendant TJ DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company; Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defendant S & S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC., A California Corporation; Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/29/2019; Served: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/01/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, David W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOOHEY JOHN H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cano, Gino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFERY MONA