This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 01:26:42 (UTC).

SANCHEZ-AVILES ET AL VS TATE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 SANCHEZ-AVILES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TATE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1425

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRELES, ALEXANDER

MIRELES-SANCHEZ, ANA

SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

Defendants

TATE, BARBARA

TATE, LEO

THE ESTATE OF LEO TATE

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

MIRELES-SANCHEZ, ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY P.

Defendant Attorney

SHARIFI PEGAH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/09/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

01/05/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Separate Statement

12/19/2022: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

12/19/2022: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

12/19/2022: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

12/19/2022: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

12/19/2022: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

12/19/2022: Notice of Motion

Separate Statement

12/19/2022: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

12/19/2022: Notice of Motion

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

12/14/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

11/30/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

11/10/2022: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

09/30/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/26/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010)

09/16/2022: Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: PLF. Alexander Mirels only, is dismissing defendants; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA|DEFENDANT - TATE, LEO|DEFENDANT - THE ESTATE OF LEO TATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Requests for Admission (Set No. One) and Plaintiff Silvia Sanchez-Aviles' Responses in Dispute (Statements); Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Silvia Sanchez-Aviles' Further Verified Responses to Requests for Admission (Set No. One) and for an Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Pe (Motions); Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement of Form Interrogatories (Set No. One) and Plaintiff Silvia Sanchez-Aviles' Responses in Dispute (Statements); Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Silvia Sanchez-Aviles' Further Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set No. One) and for an Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Pega (Motions); Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint-Defendant, Barbara Tate; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TATE, BARBARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Doe 1: The Estate of Leo Tate; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: RE: Diligence as to Defendant Leo Tate, unable to serve; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Defendant Barbara Tate via sub service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/30/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Appointing Ana Mireles-Sanchez as Guradian Ad Litem fro Alexander Mireles, a minor; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - MIRELES, ALEXANDER|PLAINTIFF - SANCHEZ-AVILES, SILVIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHARIFI PEGAH