This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:27:14 (UTC).

SALINAS VS SALINAS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SALINAS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALINAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0314

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALINAS, DAVID

Defendant

SALINAS, RICKY JOE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SALINAS, DAVID; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1515 - 20TH AVE. DELANO, CA 93215 COUNTY OF KERN; Awarded Against: SALINAS, RICKY JOE; Party: Names: SALINAS, DAVID; SALINAS, RICKY JOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Ricky Joe Salinas (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SALINAS, DAVID; Served: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less