This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 07:47:33 (UTC).

SALINAS VS MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 SALINAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MENDOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Other - Voided.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4199

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Voided

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALINAS, IRMA

Respondent

MENDOZA, VICTOR P

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • Case Voided Pursuant to GC 68634 (g) - Comment: FAILED TO PAY FEES. N.HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Document Voided Pursuant to GC 68634 (g). - Comment: FAILED TO PAY FEES. N.HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: TOTAL FEES DUE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: REQ FOR HEARING - HRG 11/17/17 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: A SIMPLE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less