This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/26/2019 at 20:51:40 (UTC).

SALCIDO VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 SALCIDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3081

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALCIDO, JORGE

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

01/20/2017 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: SALCIDO, JORGE; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 03/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/20/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff: SALCIDO, JORGE; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • Cause of Action: Small Claims Appeal; Type: Action; Filed By: 11561; Filed Against: 11561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Appeal - Judgment - After Trial De Novo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: SALCIDO, JORGE; Awarded Against: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Amount; Damages: $2,052.54; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2142.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Cause Of Action - Action Small Claims Appeal; File Date: 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 SEN TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: SONIA VERA FOR STATE FARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 03/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/20/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff: SALCIDO, JORGE; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 01/20/2017 MO; SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: SALCIDO, JORGE; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AGENT FOR SERVICE: CSC LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SALCIDO, JORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "S"

    Read MoreRead Less