This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:35:49 (UTC).

SALAZAR VS SUAREZ

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 SALAZAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SUAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0126

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR, MAURA

Defendant

SUAREZ, VANESSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SALAZAR, MAURA; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 12916 Campbell Dr Lamont, CA 93241 (back house); Awarded Against: SUAREZ, VANESSA; Party: Names: SALAZAR, MAURA; SUAREZ, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via In Pro Per/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: As to Vanessa Suarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Vanessa Suarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Vanessa Suarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SALAZAR, MAURA; Served: 12/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 12916 CAMPBELL DR (BACK HOUSE) LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less