Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 19:43:24 (UTC).

SALAS VS SALAS (C)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 SALAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALAS C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3369

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALAS, ROSALVA

Respondent

SALAS, SANTIAGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: STATUS: 05/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: LDA: DIVORCE CITY 911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less