This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 17:47:59 (UTC).

SALAS VS GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 SALAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAS, MARTIN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YBARRA, DELIA

SALAZAR, HENRY

REYNA, TONY

GARCIA, MAIRA

CITY OF SHAFTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FROST, JASON ADAMS

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HARVEY, GARY C

LOCKHART, COURTNEY B

CHO, DANIEL S.

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 03/12/18; JURY TRIAL 03/12/18; T/E 5 DAYS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT COFORM TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER & CROSS-COMPLAINT: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/25/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to Maira Garcia and Tony Reyna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice on Complaint as to Defendants Delia Ybarra and Henry Salazar only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice on cross-complaint filed by Delia Ybarra and Henry Salazar. Each party to bear their own fees and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice on Cross-Complaint of Maira Garcia and Tony Reyna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 03/12/18; JURY TRIAL 03/12/18; T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Serivce of Summons. Complaint was not served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: & FILED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/14/2017; Served: 02/14/2017; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/25/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

P—

O 0 3 N AW N

Courtney B. Lockhart, Esq., Bar No. 225128

NICOLSON LAW GROUP PC

6320 Canoga Avenuge, Suite 750 Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Office: (818) 858-1122

Fax: (818) 858-1124

E-mail: Lockhart@nicolsonlawgroup.com

Attorneys for Defendants MAIRA GARCIA and TONY REYNA

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY BAKERSFIELD

MARTIN SALAS CASE NO.: BCV-17-100053 Plaintiffs, Dept.: 17 Judge: Thomas S. Clark V.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

| CITY OF SHAFTER, MAIRA GARCIA, Complaint Filed: January 25, 2017 TONY REYNA, DELIA YBARRA, Trial Date: TBD

HENRY SALAZAR and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive,

Defendants.

COMES NOW Defendants, MAIRA GARCIA and TONY REYNA, in answer to the Complaint on file herein, admits, denies and alleges as follows:

Under the provisions of California Code of Civil Procedure Section 431.30, this answering Defendant generally and specifically denies each and every allegation contained in said Complaint, and the whole thereof, and each and every alleged cause of action thereof and

denies that Plaintiff sustained damages in the sum or sums alleged, or in any other sum or sums,

_' or at all, by reason of any act, breach or omission on the part of this answering Defendants.

FIRST AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

This answering Defendants is informed and believes and thereon alleges that at all times

mentioned herein that the negligent, careless, reckless and unlawful conduct of Plaintif i