This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 16:20:59 (UTC).

SABOVICH VS. JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 06/01/2010 SABOVICH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6248

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABOVICH, MARGARET K

Defendant

JIMENEZ, JESSICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=1275605 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:12/02/2010, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:cynthiag, SystemDate:6/1/2010 1:04:35 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 7/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 07/13/10 BY: CGARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for SABOVICH, MARGARET K (PL-1). Received from SUPERIORPROCESS SERVICES, check no(s) 3074. Receipt #534431 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: POSSESSION ONLY AS TO: JESSICA JIMENEZ SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 7/13/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARGARET K SABOVICH (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JESSICA JIMENEZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. ROGER KARLSWRUD DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGEMENT FOR PLAINTIFF FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES. NO BACK RENT IS AWARDED. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IF PREMISES IS NOT VACATED BY JULY 22, 2010 BY 8:00 A.M. EACH SIDE BEARS OWN COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ANSWER FILED BY JESSICA JIMENEZ ON 06/07/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY JESSICA JIMENEZ ON 06/07/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Jul 08, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Jul 08, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: SIGNED BY: JUDGE ARTHUR WALLACE DATE: 06/08/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY: JESSICA JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: UNLAWFU DETAINER FILED BY: JESSICA JIMENEZ DATE: 06/07/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: MARGARET SABOVICH HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 06/07/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 02, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Dec 02, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • Docket841H Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $220.00 for SABOVICH, MARGARET K (PL-1). Received from SUPERIOR PROCESS SERVICE, check no(s) 2973. Receipt #526607 for amount of $220.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

    Read MoreRead Less