This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:48 (UTC).

RYAN VS WYANNE

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 RYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WYANNE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6606

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN, DARRYL GEINE

Defendant

WYANNE, HECTOR BUSTISTA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 5/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DARRYL GEINE RYAN (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1,700.00 PLUS COURT COSTS OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: RYAN, DARRYL GEINE; Defendant: WYANNE, HECTOR BUSTISTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO JR KITCHEN CABINETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PRO PER PICK UP "RYAN"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for RYAN, (PL-1). Received from RYAN. Receipt #709347 for amount of $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 264

    Read MoreRead Less