This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:44 (UTC).

RUSSELL VS J C HUNT INC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 RUSSELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J C HUNT INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1603

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL, JAMES

Defendant

J C HUNT INC

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 07/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ENVELOPE #654583 CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ENVELOPE #653190 CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM NEEDS TO BE FINALIZED BEFORE SUBMITTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 07/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO J C HUNT INC BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ENVELOPE #654583 CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ENVELOPE #653190 CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM NEEDS TO BE FINALIZED BEFORE SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: TRIAL CONTINUED TO 7/18/17 FROM 6/6/17 AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO JAMES RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RUSSELL, JAMES; Served: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO JAMES RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.