This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/08/2020 at 07:12:51 (UTC).

RUSS VS KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 RUSS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0018

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSS, ROBERT

Defendants

KERN HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

ORTIZ, SHERRIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, MATTHEW C

BOYLES, CHAD J A

Defendant Attorney

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Christopher Hagan For: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Reason: Please submit your fees with your Notice of Posting Jury Fees. Contact the clerk's office with any questions. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; item 3b lists authorized agent on behalf of the individual to be served, however item 5 states personal service was made. This should be sub service.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: TE: 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JURY: 07/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: T/E 7 Days FCMC 7/9/21, JT 7/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 07/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 7/6/20 @ 8:15 am in Dept.10 as to Kern High School District and Sherrie Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Christopher Hagan For: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Reason: Please submit your fees with your Notice of Posting Jury Fees. Contact the clerk's office with any questions. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Hearing continued per standing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 7/6/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Kern High School District and Sherrie Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Kern High School District via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; item 3b lists authorized agent on behalf of the individual to be served, however item 5 states personal service was made. This should be sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/28/20207:53 AM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less