This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 17:46:36 (UTC).

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC VS MACFARLANE

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MACFARLANE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0975

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

Defendants

MACFARLANE, RICHARD

MACFARLANE, SHELBIE

MACFARLANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAZI-JAFARI, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/18/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/18/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY