This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 19:23:43 (UTC).

RUIZ VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 02/10/2015 RUIZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Staley, H.A. "Skip", Dulcich, Judith K., Errea, Larry A. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2096

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Dulcich, Judith K.

Errea, Larry A.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUIZ, ELIZABETH

Respondent

RUIZ, OMAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: RUIZ, ELIZABETH; RUIZ, OMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.