Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:19:47 (UTC).

RUIZ VS GALINDO

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GALINDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0439

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ, ROSEMARY

Defendant

GALINDO, HENRY THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

Defendant Attorney

MILLS, BEVERLY I

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

03/11/16 MO: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOHNSON, CRAIG E

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal Before Hearing (CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Status of Binding Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action of all Parties and all Causes of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Time Estimate 4 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: j/t & fcmc set 1/23/17 9am dept 11 t/e 4 days jury both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: RE: STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION GOOD CAUSE APPEARING HEREIN, the Court orders that the MSC and Trial dates scheduled be vacated so that the matter may proceed to Binding Arbitration: The court further sets an OSC re: Status of Binding Arbitration for June 9, 2017 at 8:30 am in Department 11. \****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE**** 12/13/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation for Binding Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2015
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: Filed by Craig E. Johnson, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: Filed by Craig E. Johnson, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Ruling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: RE: CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS FILED ON 10/19/2015 RUILING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR 10/28/2015 IS RE-SET FOR 1/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG E. JOHNSON, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MESSENGER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less