This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 03:53:06 (UTC).

RUIZ VS DIAZ

Case Summary

On 03/09/2004 RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIAZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4343

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUIZ, RAMON

RUIZ, RAFAELA

Defendants

DIAZ, NICASIA

SALGADO, ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREHMER, CHARLES R

Defendant Attorney

O'DELL, MICHAEL L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2004

DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Comment: FURTHER CMC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2004

DocketCase Management Conference Vacated - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2004

DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2004

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2004

DocketNP1430 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RAMON RUIZ (PL-1) APPEARS BY CHARLES R BREHMER. RAFAELA RUIZ (PL-2) APPEARS BY CHARLES R BREHMER. JOSEPH HANSEN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL L O'DELL ON BEHALF OF ROBERTO SALGADO (DE-2). NO APPEARANCE BY NICASIA DIAZ. CASE REFERRED TO NON-BINDING JUDICIAL ARBITRATION. FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 10/27/2004 @ 2:15 PM DIVISION A. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):183B/3509.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2004

Docket4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2004

DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Comment: CMC HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2004

DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT - MICHAEL L. O'DELL DEFENDANT - ROBERTO SALGADO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2004

DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF - CHARLES R. BREHMER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2004

Docket845E Pmt: Ltd. Civil First Appearance > $10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $292.50 for SALGADO, ROBERTO (DE-2). Received from CLIFFORD & BROWN, check no(s) 0015406. Receipt #107162 for amount of $292.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2004

DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT SALGADO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2004

DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: 30 DAY EXTESION TO RESPOND SIGNED BY: JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2004

DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: COMPLAINT, COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC, STMT OF CLASSIFICATION WHO: ROBERTO SALGADO HOW: PERSONAL SERVICE/PROCESS SERVER WHEN: 05/03/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2004

DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2004

DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: ROBERTO SALGADO IN PLACE AND INSTEAD OF DOE NO. 1.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2004

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2004

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2004

DocketComplaint - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2004

Docket844B Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $292.50 for RUIZ, RAMON (PL-1). Received from CHARLES R. BREHMER, check no(s) 3171. Receipt #83275 for amount of $292.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2004

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

[+] Read More [-] Read Less