This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 16:33:34 (UTC).

RUFFNER VS DUDLEY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 RUFFNER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUDLEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0132

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUFFNER, RYAN

Defendant

DUDLEY, REBECCA JO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: RUFFNER, RYAN; DUDLEY, REBECCA JO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Order (SC-105)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing - Comment: answer from Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RUFFNER, RYAN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less