This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:04:23 (UTC).

RUFF VS GAYNES

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 RUFF filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GAYNES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0120

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUFF, MICHAEL

Defendant

GAYNES, RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEBIG, STEVEN J

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer Filed by Randall R. Gaynes; Parties Present Plaintiff: RUFF, MICHAEL; Attorney: SIEBIG, STEVEN J

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: RUFF, MICHAEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 7000 Lakewood Dr. Lake of the Woods, CA 93225; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: GAYNES, RANDALL; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,885.00; Holdover Damages: $3,813.00; Attorney Fees: $1,000.00; Costs: $320.00; Total: $9,018.00; Party: Names: RUFF, MICHAEL; GAYNES, RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Total $9,018.00 As to Randall Gaynes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer Filed by Randall R. Gaynes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: Set for 1/21/2016 at 10:00 AM Dept: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to All Adult Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Randall Gaynes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Any and All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: RUFF, MICHAEL; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 7000 LAKEWOOD DR LAKE OF THE WOODS, CA 93225 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less