This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 19:23:40 (UTC).

RUELAS VS. RUELAS

Case Summary

On 02/10/2015 RUELAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RUELAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dulcich, Judith K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2093

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dulcich, Judith K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES DE RUELAS, GRACIELA

Respondent

RUELAS MARTINEZ, J. ENCARNACION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - 10 days - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: TORRES DE RUELAS, GRACIELA; RUELAS MARTINEZ, J. ENCARNACION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 08/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.