This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 14:16:52 (UTC).

RUBIO ET AL VS FORUCCI ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 RUBIO filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against FORUCCI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3069

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL

RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

Defendants

FORUCCI, RONALD JOSEPH

PEREZ, DAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

01/13/2023: Proof of Service

Notice of Motion

01/13/2023: Notice of Motion

Request for Interpreter

01/13/2023: Request for Interpreter

Request for Interpreter

01/13/2023: Request for Interpreter

Request for Interpreter

01/13/2023: Request for Interpreter

Request for Interpreter

01/13/2023: Request for Interpreter

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/10/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

12/29/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

12/22/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Summons Issued and Filed

12/20/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/14/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

First Amended Complaint

12/13/2022: First Amended Complaint

Affidavit

12/13/2022: Affidavit

Rejection/Correction Notice

12/08/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Order to Show Cause

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause

Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

11/28/2022: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

11/28/2022: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Leave; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: RE:Motion for Leave; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: re: Motion for Leave to File Second Amended ComplaintHearing Date: 2/10/2023Time: 8:30 amDepartment/Division: J; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Interpreter; Comment: Spanish Interpreter for 03/13/2023 at 8:30 a.m. in Div. J; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Interpreter; Comment: Spanish Interpreter for 02/10/2023 at 8:30 a.m. in Div. J; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Interpreter; Comment: Spanish Interpreter for 02/10/2023 at 8:30 a.m. in Div. J; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Paper Filing Packet: Rejected per filer, he will be submitting and answer to First Amended Complaint.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FORUCCI, RONALD JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Interpreter; Comment: Spanish Interpreter for 03/13/2023 at 8:30 a.m. in Div. J; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Affidavit; Comment: of Unsuccessful Service as to Dan Perez, 2 attempts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: re; Proof of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 03/13/2023Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: By clerk, as to plaintiff Jose Manuel Rubio. Returned via USPS.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: By clerk, as to plaintiff Maria Jesus Rubio. Returned via USPS.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, JOSE MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RUBIO, MARIA JESUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less