Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 03:40:45 (UTC).

ROTH RECOVERY ASSOCIATES INC. VS GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 ROTH RECOVERY ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUZMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0540

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROTH RECOVERY ASSOCIATES INC.

SERENGETI FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendant

GUZMAN, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NABAVI, ALI

Attorney at COASTAL LAW FIRM APLC

4533 Macarthur Blvd #777

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED ~ calid=2362234 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:09/11/2014, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, SystemDate:9/25/2013 10:38:34 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: TOTAL $8,554.51 AS TO MICHAEL GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REGARDING: 1. REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 2. COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; 3. REQUEST FOR INTEREST; 4. REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: FOR WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. ~ calid=2362232 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:03/13/2014, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, SystemDate:9/25/2013 10:38:08 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO MICHAEL GUZMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: BY MAIL. ADDRESSED TO MICHAEL GUZMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketParty Not Found Or No Service Returned - Comment: NOT FOUND PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO MICHAEL GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for ROTH RECOVERY ASSOCIATES INC. (PL-1). Received from COASTAL LAW FIRM, LLP, check no(s) 2452. Receipt #740373 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 13, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 13, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY ALI NABAVI, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: LAW FIRM OF COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF IS COASTAL LAW FIRM, APLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY ALI NABAVI, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROTH RECOVERY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SERENGETI FINANCIAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABAVI, ALI