This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 18:03:31 (UTC).

ROSS CHARLES LANE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/21/2015 ROSS CHARLES LANE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph Wm., Loo, Cynthia L. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4614

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN

Decedent

LANE, ROSS CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, JOSHUA G

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN

Order to Appear

Order to Appear 11/30/2017: Order to Appear 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - ORDER TO APPEAR/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ASTREA M BRANDIN LANE; Parties Present Petitioner: LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Subsitution of attorney returned to attorney via AMS outbakset

Compliance Hearing

4/6/17 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 3/1/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner: LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 9/12/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner: LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 09/22/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Compliance Hearing

8/11/16 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 7/26/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

MO Compliance hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 4/8/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Petition

Petition for family allowance 070915: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition

Peition for Family Allowance MO 052815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: MATTER NOT REVIEWED DUE TO STAFFING CONSTRAINTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order directing final distribution on waiver of account and for allowance of compensation for ordinary and extraordinary services Probate code 10810, 10811, 11640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: to Peition for Final Distribution on Waiverof Account and For Allowance of Compensation for Ordinary and Extraordinary Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Order to Appear 11/30/2017: Order to Appear 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - ORDER TO APPEAR/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO ASTREA M BRANDIN LANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: report of status of administrator or petition to close the estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney: Joshua G Wilson Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Subsitution of attorney returned to attorney via AMS outbakset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver of account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Satisfaction and release of creditor's claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: Petition for final distribution on waiver of account and for allowance of compensation for ordinary and extraordinary services Probate code 10810, 10811, 11640

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Original Type: Petition for Letters; Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph Wm.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Tentative Ruling: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS (PSP) PSP - READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for LANE, ASTREA M BRANDIN (PE-1). Received from DARLING & WILSON, check no(s) 24240. Receipt #819582 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: CONFIDENTIAL COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY 3/5/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.