This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 23:23:17 (UTC).

ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1374

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R

Defendant Attorney

HEARNE HEATHER D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

06/03/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

06/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

06/03/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

06/14/2022: Order to Show Cause

Answer to Complaint

07/01/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

07/06/2022: Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

Ruling

07/08/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Removal of Action (JBSIS); Filed By: DEFENDANT - CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CONDUENT COMMERCIAL SOLUTIONS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/26/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ROSIO VENTURA, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less