Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 19:40:51 (UTC).

ROSE MARY RAMOS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 ROSE MARY RAMOS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2916

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

MARMOLEJO, SUSAN

RAMOS, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KLEIER, TIMOTHY L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. #2b(3) request to be appointed Administrator & petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. Need clarification by verified supplement 2. Petitioner request to be appointed with Limited Authority which is inconsistent with 2c requesting Full Authority. 3. #3f on petition is incomplete. 4. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in within this case. 5. Need attachment 3f(3) re declaration of lost Will. 6. #3g (2) indicates petitioner is entitled to Letters, however, petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. 7. #4 of petition is not marked re decedent's Will which is inconsistent with petition re decedent died testate. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 8. #5a(7) indicates issue(s) of a predeceased child, however, child not listed on #8. Need named and date of death of predeceased child & issue. 9. Missing attachment 8 as indicated on petition. 10. Need proof of mailing to everyone listed on #8 & issue(s) of predeceased child. 11. Need name & date of death of predeceased child.; Parties Present Petitioner: MARMOLEJO, SUSAN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for probate...returned via in pro per out basket

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 05/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SUPPLEMENTS FILED 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18 REVIEWED, HOWEVER, THE FOLLOWING SAME NOTES STILL REMAIN- 1. #2b(3) request to be appointed Administrator & petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. Need clarification by verified supplement 2. Petitioner request to be appointed with Limited Authority which is inconsistent with 2c requesting Full Authority. 3. #3f on petition is incomplete. 4. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in within this case. 5. Need attachment 3f(3) re declaration of lost Will. 6. #3g (2) indicates petitioner is entitled to Letters, however, petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. 7. #4 of petition is not marked re decedent's Will which is inconsistent with petition re decedent died testate. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 8. #5a(7) indicates issue(s) of a predeceased child, however, child not listed on #8. Need named and date of death of predeceased child & issue. 9. Missing attachment 8 as indicated on petition. 10. Need proof of mailing to everyone listed on #8 & issue(s) of predeceased child. 11. Need name & date of death of predeceased child. SAME NEW NOTES - 12. Address listed for Irene, Jenny, Vanessa, Victor, Steve & Veronica on Notice of Petition filed 12/21/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 13. Claudia Robinson listed on notice of petition filed 12/27/17 and not in petition. What is Claudia's relationship to decedent? 14. Savannah Grizzell/granddaughter listed on proof of mailing to objections filed 12/05/17 & not listed on petition. Need clarification and proof of service to same. 15. Need proof of service to supplements filed 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18. ***NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED 12/05/17 - 16. Address to Rose Burns listed on proof of service attached to objections filed 12/05/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Was Rose Burns properly served? NEW NOTE- 17. Missing proof of mailing for supplements & document entitled Contest of Will.; Parties Present Petitioner: MARMOLEJO, SUSAN; Objector; Attorney: KLEIER, TIMOTHY L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Contest submitted will returned via outbakset

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Contest submitted will returned via outbakset

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Contest, etc. returned via outbasket

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SUPPLEMENTS FILED 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18 REVIEWED, HOWEVER, THE FOLLOWING NOTES STILL REMAIN- 1. #2b(3) request to be appointed Administrator & petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. Need clarification by verified supplement 2. Petitioner request to be appointed with Limited Authority which is inconsistent with 2c requesting Full Authority. 3. #3f on petition is incomplete. 4. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in within this case. 5. Need attachment 3f(3) re declaration of lost Will. 6. #3g (2) indicates petitioner is entitled to Letters, however, petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. 7. #4 of petition is not marked re decedent's Will which is inconsistent with petition re decedent died testate. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 8. #5a(7) indicates issue(s) of a predeceased child, however, child not listed on #8. Need named and date of death of predeceased child & issue. 9. Missing attachment 8 as indicated on petition. 10. Need proof of mailing to everyone listed on #8 & issue(s) of predeceased child. 11. Need name & date of death of predeceased child. NEW NOTES - 12. Address listed for Irene, Jenny, Vanessa, Victor, Steve & Veronica on Notice of Petition filed 12/21/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 13. Claudia Robinson listed on notice of petition filed 12/27/17 and not in petition. What is Claudia's relationship to decedent? 14. Savannah Grizzell/granddaughter listed on proof of mailing to objections filed 12/05/17 & not listed on petition. Need clarification and proof of service to same. 15. Need proof of service to supplements filed 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18. ***NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED 12/05/17 - 16. Address to Rose Burns listed on proof of service attached to objections filed 12/05/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Was Rose Burns properly served?; Parties Present Petitioner: MARMOLEJO, SUSAN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte for new trial date; returned via pro per outbasket "M"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Sanctions and or citation...; returned via pro per outbasket "M"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte application and order; returned via pro per outbasket "M"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 05/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SUPPLEMENTS FILED 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18 REVIEWED, HOWEVER, THE FOLLOWING SAME NOTES STILL REMAIN- 1. #2b(3) request to be appointed Administrator & petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. Need clarification by verified supplement 2. Petitioner request to be appointed with Limited Authority which is inconsistent with 2c requesting Full Authority. 3. #3f on petition is incomplete. 4. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in within this case. 5. Need attachment 3f(3) re declaration of lost Will. 6. #3g (2) indicates petitioner is entitled to Letters, however, petition is for Lost Will & for Letters Testamentary. 7. #4 of petition is not marked re decedent's Will which is inconsistent with petition re decedent died testate. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 8. #5a(7) indicates issue(s) of a predeceased child, however, child not listed on #8. Need named and date of death of predeceased child & issue. 9. Missing attachment 8 as indicated on petition. 10. Need proof of mailing to everyone listed on #8 & issue(s) of predeceased child. 11. Need name & date of death of predeceased child. SAME NEW NOTES - 12. Address listed for Irene, Jenny, Vanessa, Victor, Steve & Veronica on Notice of Petition filed 12/21/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 13. Claudia Robinson listed on notice of petition filed 12/27/17 and not in petition. What is Claudia's relationship to decedent? 14. Savannah Grizzell/granddaughter listed on proof of mailing to objections filed 12/05/17 & not listed on petition. Need clarification and proof of service to same. 15. Need proof of service to supplements filed 12/27/17, 12/28/17 & 01/11/18. ***NOTE PERTAINS TO OBJECTIONS FILED 12/05/17 - 16. Address to Rose Burns listed on proof of service attached to objections filed 12/05/17 is inconsistent with address listed on petition. Was Rose Burns properly served? NEW NOTE- 17. Missing proof of mailing for supplements & document entitled Contest of Will.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition permissive to disclose false statements/evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: First supplement to objections to appointment of personal representative in response to probate notes #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketHolographic Will - Comment: BRW-17-001174 7/28/16 One (1) page - double sided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for probate...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Susan Marmolejo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Susan Marmolejo

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIER, TIMOTHY L